EP3866749 - COSMETIC FOAM WHICH IS SUITABLE FOR JAR PRODUCTS AND PRODUCTION OF SUCH COSMETIC FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKUBSCH, Kerstin Hauptstraße 99 25497 Prisdorf / DE | 02 /
NECKERMANN, Inken Dammsknöll 14 25767 Offenbüttel / DE | 03 /
MEYER, Christiane Agathenstraße 11 20357 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
GÖDDERTZ, Dominik Radenwisch 20 b 22457 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
MADAUS, Sven Hasloer Weg 13 25474 Bönningstedt / DE | 06 /
RATHSACK, Michele Pierre Orchideenstraße 24 21614 Buxtehude / DE | 07 /
LÜGGER, Svenja Lütt Iserbrook 67 22589 Hamburg / DE | 08 /
DONATH, Jens Bartelssaal 4a 22359 Hamburg / DE | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19773072.4 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP75312 | Priority number, date | DE201810217678 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018217678 | [2021/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078659 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866749 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61K8/06, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/92, A61Q19/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61K8/046 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K2800/30 (EP);
A61K2800/33 (EP);
A61K2800/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHER SCHAUM, DER FÜR TIEGELPRODUKTE GEEIGNET IST UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2021/34] | English: | COSMETIC FOAM WHICH IS SUITABLE FOR JAR PRODUCTS AND PRODUCTION OF SUCH COSMETIC FOAM | [2021/34] | French: | MOUSSE COSMÉTIQUE APPROPRIÉE POUR DES PRODUITS DE CREUSET ET SA PRODUCTION | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 17.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002192245 (JENSEN CLAUDE JARKAE [US], et al) [Y] 1-17* paragraphs [0001] , [ 0078]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP2005937 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0010]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE102015221567 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0001]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2017076615 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, line 10 - line 14; example -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0104387 | DE10058384 | EP1216682 | EP1314416 | EP1337226 | EP1372577 | DE10333710 | WO2006103102 | EP1866362 | WO2015097594 |