EP3837912 - METHODS, TERMINAL DEVICE AND INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT USING TRANSMISSION ON A PRECONFIGURED UPLINK RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | ||
For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Shin Horng c/o Sony Europe B.V . IP Europe Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
BEALE, Martin Warwick c/o Sony Europe B.V . IP Europe Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19773125.0 | 26.09.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019EP76081 | Priority number, date | EP20180197765 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18197765 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020064950 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837912 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L1/18 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04L1/1664 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L1/0061 (US);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L1/188 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND INFRASTRUKTURAUSRÜSTUNG MITTELS ÜBERTRAGUNG AUF EINER VORKONFIGURIERTEN UPLINK-RESSOURCE | [2021/25] | English: | METHODS, TERMINAL DEVICE AND INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT USING TRANSMISSION ON A PRECONFIGURED UPLINK RESOURCE | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET ÉQUIPEMENT D'INFRASTRUCTURE UTILISANT UNE TRANSMISSION SUR UNE RESSOURCE DE LIAISON MONTANTE PRÉCONFIGURÉE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 14.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2018191478 (UHLING THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,10,20,47,48,51,58 * paragraphs [0207] - [0208] *; | [Y]US2018242356 (WU QIANG [CN], et al) [Y] 27,32,65,70* paragraphs [0095] - [0098] *; | [XYI] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "Considerations on UL grant-free transmissions for mMTC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609893 CONSIDERATIONS ON UL GRANT-FREE TRANSMISSIONS FOR MMTC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051149919 [X] 1-3,5,8,12,15,23,34,37,42-44,46,49,53,61,72,77-82 * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 4,6,7,10,13,16,17,20,24-33,35,36,38-40,45,47,48,51,54,58,62-71,73-75 [I] 9,11,14,18,19,21,22,41,50,52,55-57,59,60,76 | [X] - NOKIA ET AL, "UE identification and HARQ for URLLC UL grant-free", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710994_UE IDENTIFICATION AND HARQ FOR URLLC UL GRANT-FREE_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLI, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051300194 [X] 1,42,72,77-82 * paragraph [0004] * | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on grant-free uplink transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170514 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707655 DISCUSSION ON GRANT-FREE UPLINK TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051272862 [Y] 4,45 * paragraph [0003] * | [YA] - NOKIA ET AL, "Transmission in preconfigured UL resources", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1808431_TRANS_IN_PRECONFIG_UL_RESOURCES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1808431%2Ezip, (20180810), XP051515813 [Y] 13,16,24-26,28-31,35,38-40,54,62-64,66-69,73-75 * page 3 * [A] 1-12,14,15,17-23,27,32-34,36,37,41-53,55-61,65,70-72,76-82 | [Y] - "Retransmission scheme for contention based access", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-102461 RETRANSMISSION OF CB ACCESS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100406), vol. RAN WG2, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050422693 [Y] 17,33,36,71 * paragraph [0002] * | by applicant | - "TS36.212", Multiplexing and channel coding (Rel-15 | EP20180188600 |