EP3837519 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A LEAKAGE IN A CONDUIT IN WHICH A FLUID FLOWS AND SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Persi Del Marmo, Paolo Via Marche 84 00187 Roma / IT | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Ferriero, Paolo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.a. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19773570.7 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019IT50186 | Priority number, date | IT20180008079 | 13.08.2018 Original published format: IT201800008079 | [2021/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035888 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837519 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3837519 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/04, G01M3/38, G01M3/16 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G01M3/38 (EP,US);
G01M3/165 (EP,US);
G06F17/12 (US);
G06F17/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER LECKAGE IN EINER LEITUNG, IN DER EIN FLUID FLIESST, UND SYSTEM DAMIT | [2021/25] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A LEAKAGE IN A CONDUIT IN WHICH A FLUID FLOWS AND SYSTEM THEREOF | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE FUITE DANS UN CONDUIT DANS LEQUEL S'ÉCOULE UN FLUIDE ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 08.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4927232 (GRIFFITHS RICHARD W [US]); | [A]US2011007996 (HUFFMAN JOHN S [US]); | [A]US2015285705 (KUMAR AMIT [US], et al) |