EP3849480 - CONVEX OSTOMY BARRIER AND METHOD OF FORMING CONVEX OSTOMY BARRIERS OF VARIOUS SOFTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hollister Incorporated 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Kenneth 2000 Hollister Drive Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19773690.3 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50607 | Priority number, date | US201862730109P | 12.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862730109 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055998 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849480 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/448 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
A61F5/448 (EP,US);
A61F2005/4483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | KONVEXE STOMA-BARRIERE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KONVEXEN STOMA-BARRIEREN MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHER WEICHHEIT | [2021/29] | English: | CONVEX OSTOMY BARRIER AND METHOD OF FORMING CONVEX OSTOMY BARRIERS OF VARIOUS SOFTNESS | [2021/29] | French: | BARRIÈRE DE STOMIE CONVEXE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE BARRIÈRES DE STOMIE CONVEXES DE SOUPLESSE DIFFÉRENTE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 27.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP0415282 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [XAI]WO2018067539 (HOLLISTER INC [US]); | [XAI]WO2018093815 (HOLLISTER INC [US]) |