EP3778636 - ANTI-CD27 ANTIBODY, ANTIGEN-BINDING FRAGMENT THEREOF AND MEDICAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Hengrui Medicine Co., Ltd. No. 7 Kunlunshan Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Hao No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Yan No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Zhen No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 04 /
SHI, Ruijun No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 05 /
JIANG, Jiahua No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 06 /
CAO, Guoqing No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Lianshan No.7 Kunlunshan Road, Economic and Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19774201.8 | 27.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN79811 | Priority number, date | CN201810267050 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810267050 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019184935 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778636 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C12N15/09, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C12N1/15, C12P21/08, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/64 (KR);
A61P19/02 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P37/00 (KR);
C12N15/1037 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (KR,US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | ANTI-CD27-ANTIKÖRPER, ANTIGENBINDENDES FRAGMENT DAVON UND MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/07] | English: | ANTI-CD27 ANTIBODY, ANTIGEN-BINDING FRAGMENT THEREOF AND MEDICAL USE THEREOF | [2021/07] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CD27, FRAGMENT DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE DE CELUI-CI ET UTILISATION MÉDICALE ASSOCIÉE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | Translation filed | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]AU2016216524 (CELLDEX THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * The human/cyno anti-CD27 antibodies; mAb 2G9;; figure 1; table 1; sequences 7,13,19 *; | [I]WO2016145085 (CELLDEX THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * The whole document, in particular, the examples *; | [XP]WO2018059465 (JIANGSU HENGRUI MEDICINE CO [CN]) [XP] 1-15* anti-hCD27 mAb077;; sequences 9,10,12 * | International search | [A]CN102007147 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD)[A] 1-14; | [A]CN104284678 (JANSSEN BIOTECH INC) [A] 1-14; | [A]CN105669865 (CELLDEX THERAPEUTICS INC) [A] 1-14; | [PX]WO2018059465 (JIANGSU HENGRUI MEDICINE CO [CN]) [PX] 1-14 | by applicant | WO2008051424 | WO2011130434 | CN103154034 | - CAMERINI et al., J Immunol, (19910000), vol. 147, pages 3165 - 69 | - KOBATA T et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19950000), vol. 24, pages 11249 - 53 | - RANHEIM EA et al., Blood, (19950000), vol. 85, no. 12, pages 3556 - 65 | - LOENEN WA et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 22, page 447 | - J. Biol. Chem, (19680000), vol. 243, page 3558 | - TOMLINSON et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - COOK et al., Immunology Today, (19950000), vol. 16, pages 237 - 242 | - ENRIQUE et al., Int Immunol, (19971200), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 1801 - 15 | - WINTER et al., Annual Rev. lmmunol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 433 - 55 | - The Immunoglobulin FactsBook, (20010000), ISBN ISBN 014441351 | - Using Antibodies: A Laboratory Manualor Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory |