EP3777888 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT AND/OR PREVENTION OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANO, Fumiyoshi c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries, Inc. 10-1, Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Takanori c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries, Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19774904.7 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP14044 | Priority number, date | JP20180067453 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018067453 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019189780 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777888 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61K31/4745, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P43/00, C07K16/30, C12N15/13 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K31/337 (US);
A61K31/437 (US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,KR);
A61K39/39541 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C07K16/46 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61K39/395, A61K31/4745, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P43/00, C07K16/30, C07K16/46, C12N15/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER PRÄVENTION VON KREBS | [2021/07] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT AND/OR PREVENTION OF CANCER | [2021/07] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LA PRÉVENTION DU CANCER | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2020 | Translation filed | 12.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 18.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2324842 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [XYI]EP2818481 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | International search | [Y]WO2011096535 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2013147176 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]JP2018502892 ; | [PA]WO2018079740 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | by applicant | EP0239400 | WO9602576 | WO9951743 | US6602684 | US6737056 | WO2004063351 | WO2005063351 | EP1914244 | US7579170 | WO2010016526 | WO2011005481 | WO2011096535 | WO2011096517 | WO2011096528 | WO2011096519 | WO2011096533 | WO2011096534 | WO2011120135 | WO2013018886 | WO2013018894 | WO2013018892 | WO2013018891 | WO2013018889 | WO2013018883 | US8388955 | WO2013125636 | WO2013125654 | WO2013125630 | WO2013125640 | WO2013147169 | WO2013147176 | WO2014012479 | US8642292 | WO2015020212 | WO2015112749 | WO2016004875 |