blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3776421

EP3776421 - SYSTEM FOR CREDENTIAL STORAGE AND VERIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.01.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Workday, Inc.
6110 Stoneridge Mall Road
Pleasanton CA 94588 / US
[2021/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HAMEL, Bjorn
6110 Stoneridge Mall Road
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
02 / RUGGIERO, Jonathan, David
6110 Stoneridge Mall Road
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
 [2021/07]
Representative(s)McKinnon, Alistair James
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[2021/07]
Application number, filing date19775628.127.03.2019
[2021/07]
WO2019US24260
Priority number, dateUS201862648854P27.03.2018         Original published format: US 201862648854 P
US20181602123428.06.2018         Original published format: US201816021234
US20181602124328.06.2018         Original published format: US201816021243
US20181602124028.06.2018         Original published format: US201816021240
US201962798393P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798393 P
US201962798397P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798397 P
US201962798400P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798400 P
US201962798404P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798404 P
US201962798391P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798391 P
US201962798389P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798389 P
US201962798403P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798403 P
US201962798387P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798387 P
US201962798398P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798398 P
US201962798402P29.01.2019         Original published format: US 201962798402 P
US20191636540226.03.2019         Original published format: US201916365402
[2021/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019191216
Date:03.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3776421
Date:17.02.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.10.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2021
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/64, H04L29/06, G06Q20/22, G06Q99/00, H04L9/32, G06Q20/38, G06Q30/00, G06Q40/02, G06Q50/26, H04L9/08, H04L29/08
[2021/49]
CPC:
G06F21/64 (EP); G06Q20/3825 (EP); G06Q20/3829 (EP);
G06Q30/00 (EP); G06Q40/02 (EP); G06Q50/265 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP); H04L63/12 (EP); H04L67/1097 (EP);
H04L9/0891 (EP); H04L9/3239 (EP); H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04L9/3271 (EP); H04L9/50 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2021/07]G06Q20/22, G06Q99/00, H04L9/32, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/07]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR SPEICHERUNG UND ÜBERPRÜFUNG VON ZUGANGSDATEN[2021/07]
English:SYSTEM FOR CREDENTIAL STORAGE AND VERIFICATION[2021/07]
French:SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE ET DE VÉRIFICATION DE JUSTIFICATIF D'IDENTITÉ[2021/07]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2020National basic fee paid 
18.09.2020Search fee paid 
18.09.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2020Examination requested  [2021/07]
12.05.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2009119756  (ACUNA VICTOR A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013030989  (GELLER MARILYN GRUNZWEIG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2015278824  (ZABAR ED ADI [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2016149896  (SARKISSIAN SHAUNT M [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2017127564  (PRIV8PAY INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]  - Ori Jacobovitz , "Blockchain for identity management", Beer Sheva, Israel, (20161211), pages 1 - 19, Technical Report , URL: https:llwww.cs.bgu.ac.il/-frankeirTechnicalReports/2016/16-02.pdf, (20180831), XP055503803 [A] 1-20 * entire document *
by applicant   - WINDLEY et al., Sovrin (TM): A Protocol and Token for Self-Sovereign Identity and Decentralized Trust A White Paper from the Sovrin Foundation
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.