EP3779534 - POLY(VINYL ALCOHOL) FILM AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR POLARIZING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Yohei c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0021 / JP | 02 /
KUSAKA, Yasunari c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0021 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Nami c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0021 / JP | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Yohei c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
KUSAKA, Yasunari c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0021 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAJIMA, Nami c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19776391.5 | 28.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP13865 | Priority number, date | JP20180070355 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018070355 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019189687 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779534 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3779534 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, C08F118/08, C08J5/18, G02B1/04 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G02B5/3033 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR,US);
B29C55/02 (KR);
C08F118/08 (EP);
G02B1/04 (EP,KR);
C08J2329/04 (KR);
C08J2429/04 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L29/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | G02B5/30, C08F118/08, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLY(VINYLALKOHOL)FOLIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR POLARISIERENDE FOLIE | [2023/35] | English: | POLY(VINYL ALCOHOL) FILM AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR POLARIZING FILM | [2021/07] | French: | FILM DE POLY(ALCOOL VINYLIQUE) ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FILM POLARISANT | [2021/07] |
Former [2021/07] | POLY(VINYLALKOHOL)FOLIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR POLARISIERENDEN FOLIE | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2020 | Translation filed | 23.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015020046 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0109]; examples 2,4; table 1 *; | [A]CN107728247 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-8* %-tage of crystalline component A is less than 10%; paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0253]; example 1 * | International search | [A]JPH06136151 (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2002236214 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-8 * , [0018], [0062]-[0076] *; | [A]JP2012082313 (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-8* , *; | [A]WO2015020046 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , [0007], [0021]-[0026], [0067], [0069], [0087] - [0094], [0097] - [0110] & TW 201509955 A & CN 105408783 A & KR 10-2016-0041921 A *; | [A]WO2018003671 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , [0012], [0086]-[0103] & CN 109416424 A & KR 10-2019-0022550 A & TW 201815915 A *; | [A]JP2018028662 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-8 * , [0029] - [0034], [0143] - [0195] & CN 107728247 A & TW 201809034 A & KR 10-1819414 B1 * | by applicant | JP3422759B | JP2018002983 |