EP3773088 - A SOUS VIDE APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breville Pty Limited Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOXLEE, Brendan c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor Suite 2, 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 02 /
UPSTON, Gregory c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 03 /
MENG, Lichan c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 04 /
ROSIAN, Marian Silviu c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 05 /
ROSE, Vyvyan c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor Suite 2, 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 06 /
SHEN, William c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | [2021/31] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
FOXLEE, Brendan c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor Suite 2, 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | ||
02 /
UPSTON, Gregory c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | |||
03 /
MENG, Amanda c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | |||
04 /
ROSIAN, Marian Silviu c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | |||
05 /
ROSE, Vyvyan c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor Suite 2, 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | |||
06 /
SHEN, William c/o Breville Pty Limited, Ground Floor, Suite 2 170-180 Bourke Road Alexandria, New South Wales 2015 / AU | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19776870.8 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019AU50280 | Priority number, date | AU20180901051 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: AU 2018901051 | AU20180902304 | 27.06.2018 Original published format: AU 2018902304 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183682 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773088 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/10, A47J36/24 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A47J27/10 (EP,AU,US);
A47J27/004 (US);
A47J36/2405 (EP,AU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | SOUS-VIDE-GERÄT | [2021/07] | English: | A SOUS VIDE APPLIANCE | [2021/07] | French: | APPAREIL SOUS VIDE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013220143 (FETTERMAN ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [A]EP2767159 (WU JEFF [US], et al); | [A]US2016192801 (WU JEFF [US]); | [XA]WO2017066692 (CHEFSTEPS INC [US]); | [A]CN106859286 (BEIJING NAISI SHANPIN SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2013220143 (FETTERMAN ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [A]EP2767159 (WU JEFF [US], et al); | [A]US2016192801 (WU JEFF [US]); | [XA]WO2017066692 (CHEFSTEPS INC [US]); | [A]CN106859286 (BEIJING NAISI SHANPIN SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) |