EP3774637 - A BOTTLE WITH SENSORS FOR PROBING AND OPTIMIZING BOTTLING LINE PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G3 Enterprises, Inc. 502 E. Whitmore Avenue Modesto, CA 95358 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, John 2674 Gilberte Court Tracy, CA 95304 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19777339.3 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24981 | Priority number, date | US201862650695P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650695 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191670 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774637 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/08, B67D1/12, B65C9/40, B67B3/26, B67C3/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/146 (EP,US);
B65C9/40 (EP);
B65D1/02 (US);
B65D23/00 (US);
B65D25/02 (US);
B65D51/245 (US);
B65D81/02 (US);
B67B3/26 (EP);
B67C3/007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | B67D1/08, B67D1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | FLASCHE MIT SENSOREN ZUM ABTASTEN UND OPTIMIEREN DER LEISTUNG EINER ABFÜLLANLAGE | [2021/07] | English: | A BOTTLE WITH SENSORS FOR PROBING AND OPTIMIZING BOTTLING LINE PERFORMANCE | [2021/07] | French: | BOUTEILLE COMPORTANT DES CAPTEURS POUR SONDER ET OPTIMISER LES PERFORMANCES D'UNE CHAÎNE D'EMBOUTEILLAGE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 16.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017178980 (SENGUPTA SOUMALYA [IN]) [X] 1,2,8,10-15 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0086] * * figures 5A, 7A, 7B, 9 * * claim 19 *; | [X]US2017156540 (WHEATLEY MAXIM D [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0135] *; | [X]CN2145560Y (XUE BANGCHUN [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005153885 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP3100974 (ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV S A [BE]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]CN102327192 (WUJIANG FENGYI TEXTILE CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [XYA]US2017156540 (WHEATLEY MAXIM D [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 8, 10, 12-16 * ; figures 1-5, 18, 32, paragraphs [0027], [0133], [0143], [0181], [0201]-[0202], [0212], [0249], [0276] * [Y] 3-4, 6-7, 9, 17 [A] 5, 11, 18-19; | [Y]US2006026971 (SHARPE RICHARD [US]) [Y] 3 * ; figures 2E, 2H, paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]WO2015069916 (THERMOS LLC [US]) [Y] 4, 9 * ; page 6 lines 27-30 *; | [Y]US2015307245 (PUCCINI STEVEN D [US]) [Y] 6-7 * ; figure 7A-7B, paragraphs [0060]-[0061] *; | [Y]US2005067365 (HANAFUSA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 17 * ; figures 2-4, paragraph [0093] *; | [A]WO2015036535 (MICRO MATIC AS [DK]) [A] 5 * ; figures 3-4, page 7 lines 21-22, page 11 lines 25-37, page 12 lines 1-22 *; | [A]DE102015102590 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 5 * ; figure 3 *; | [A]US2015355012 (GURUMOHAN PRABHANJAN C [US], et al) [A] 11 * ; paragraphs [0053], [0057] *; | [A]EP1665135 (CLAESSENS FRANCES M [GB], et al) [A] 11 * ; figures 2, 4 *; | [A]WO2015188068 (SUPERCOOLER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 11 * ; figure 3, page 13 line 3 *; | [A]US3734330 (DANNER W, et al) [A] 18 * ; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006076307 (CHUNG HYUN-SOO [KR]) [A] 18 * ; figure 3 *; | [A]CN2131419Y (LIU XUECHENG [CN]) [A] 19 * ; figure 1 *; | [A]CN2145560Y (XUE BANGCHUN [CN]) [A] 19 * ; figures 1-2, page 1 paragraph 9 * |