EP3778075 - SINTERED POROUS SILVER FILM AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR JOINT BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUYAMA Kotaro c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 1002-14, Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI Kazuhiko c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Central Research Institute, 1002-14, Mukohyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19777787.3 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP12119 | Priority number, date | JP20180061321 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018061321 | JP20190050381 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019050381 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019188793 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778075 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/11, B22F1/00, B22F7/08, C22C1/08, H01L21/52, B23K35/02, B22F7/00, C22C1/04, H01L23/00, B22F7/06 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
B22F3/11 (EP,KR,US);
B22F7/002 (KR);
B22F1/054 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B22F7/004 (EP);
B22F7/064 (EP);
B22F7/08 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/001 (EP);
B32B15/16 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B3/26 (EP);
B32B5/16 (EP,US);
B32B9/048 (EP,US);
C22C1/0466 (EP);
C22C1/08 (KR,US);
H01L21/52 (KR,US);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
B22F2301/255 (KR);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2255/00 (EP);
B32B2255/06 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2264/105 (EP);
B32B2307/542 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2457/08 (EP);
B32B2457/14 (EP);
B32B2457/202 (EP);
H01L2224/05639 (EP);
H01L2224/05644 (EP);
H01L2224/2731 (EP);
H01L2224/2732 (EP);
H01L2224/29294 (EP);
H01L2224/29339 (EP);
H01L2224/32227 (EP);
H01L2224/83097 (EP);
H01L2224/83192 (EP);
H01L2224/8384 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05639, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05644, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/2731, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/2732, H01L2924/00014 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/07] | B22F3/11, B22F1/00, B22F7/08, C22C1/08, H01L21/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | GESINTERTER PORÖSER SILBERFILM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR VERBINDUNGSKÖRPER | [2021/07] | English: | SINTERED POROUS SILVER FILM AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR JOINT BODY | [2021/07] | French: | FILM D'ARGENT POREUX FRITTÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION POUR CORPS DE JOINT | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2020 | Translation filed | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009131193 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]WO2013133085 (NAMICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2015041974 (KOBAYASHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claims 3, 7-9 * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0077] * * paragraphs [0083] , [ 0087] * [I] 2; | [A]KR101749357B (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2012224885 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-2 * , *; | [A]JP2017111975 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-2* , * | by applicant | JP2017111975 | JP2018061321 | JP2019050381 | JP20160169411 |