EP3780647 - ACOUSTIC OUTPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAKA, Mayu c/o SONY CORPORATION, 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YAEGASHI, Taku c/o SONY CORPORATION, 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
KARASAWA, Sai c/o SONY CORPORATION, 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19777869.9 | 30.01.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP03157 | Priority number, date | JP20180058139 | 26.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018058139 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019187610 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780647 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04R1/105 (EP,US);
H04R1/1016 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/08 (US);
H04R1/1041 (US);
H04R1/1066 (EP);
H04R1/1075 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | AKUSTIKAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | ACOUSTIC OUTPUT DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SORTIE ACOUSTIQUE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2020 | Translation filed | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010074462 (LEE SUNG HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO2014162407 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-5 * [A] 4,6,14,15 | International search | [A]JPH04199999 (TERUMO CORP) [A] 1-18* , page 2, lower left column, line 4 to page 3, lower right column, line 2, fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010200074 (AUDIO TECHNICA KK) [A] 1-18 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0023], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015076856 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-18 * , paragraphs [0023]-[0041], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0750892 |