Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2024 | Change - representative | |
23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
11.08.2023 | Change - representative | |
21.07.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.07.2023 | First examination report | |
20.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2022 | Change - applicant | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
07.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.11.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 | Change - classification | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 | Change - classification | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
28.05.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
28.05.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
23.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.01.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
07.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.09.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2020 | Change - representative | |
28.08.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.10.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.10.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |