EP3779891 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRAINING NEURAL NETWORK MODEL, AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING TIME-LAPSE PHOTOGRAPHY VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states TENCENT TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) COMPANY LIMITED 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Wenhan 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
MA, Lin 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Wei 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19778365.7 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN76724 | Priority number, date | CN201810253848 | 26.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810253848 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019184654 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779891 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/20, G06K9/00, G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
G06N3/088 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/2193 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06T15/20 (EP);
G06V20/41 (US);
G06V20/49 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | G06T15/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAINIEREN EINES NEURONALEN NETZWERKMODELLS SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ZEITRAFFER-FOTOGRAFIE-VIDEO | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRAINING NEURAL NETWORK MODEL, AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING TIME-LAPSE PHOTOGRAPHY VIDEO | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENTRAÎNER UN MODÈLE DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR GÉNÉRER UNE VIDÉO PHOTOGRAPHIQUE À INTERVALLES DE TEMPS | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2020 | Translation filed | 27.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 05.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7289127 (ZIMMER MARK [US], et al); | [A]CN102737369 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]CN106779073 (UNIV XIAN SHIYOU ); | [A]CN107624243 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC) |