EP3853422 - THERMAL STRUCTURE FOR BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitat de Lleida Pl. de Victor Siurana, 1 25003 Lleida / ES | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE GRACIA CUESTA, Álvaro Edifici CREA C. Pere de Cabrera S/N 25001 Lleida / ES | 02 /
PÉREZ LUQUE, Gabriel Edifici CREA C. Pere de Cabrera S/N 25001 Lleida / ES | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 19778457.2 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019EP75397 | Priority number, date | ES20180030915 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: ES 201830915 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058500 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853422 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/80, C09K5/06, F24F5/00, F28D20/02, E04B1/74 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
B65D11/12 (EP);
E04B1/76 (ES);
C09K5/063 (EP);
E04B1/74 (EP);
F24F5/0021 (EP);
F24F5/0075 (EP);
F24F5/0089 (EP);
F24S20/66 (EP,ES);
F24S60/10 (EP);
F28D20/023 (EP);
B65D2215/00 (EP);
E04B2001/742 (EP);
F24F2005/0032 (EP);
F24F2005/0082 (EP);
F24S20/61 (EP);
F24S70/14 (EP);
F24S80/60 (EP);
Y02A30/00 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B30/90 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | THERMISCHE STRUKTUR FÜR GEBÄUDE | [2021/30] | English: | THERMAL STRUCTURE FOR BUILDINGS | [2021/30] | French: | STRUCTURE THERMIQUE POUR BÂTIMENTS | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4290416 (MALONEY TIMOTHY) [X] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 7, line 14; figure - *; | [XYI]WO8700569 (INTEGRALE ENERGIE UMWELTTECH [CH]) [X] 1-4,6,7,11,13,14,16 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2; figure - * [Y] 5,8-10 [I] 15,17; | [A]US2012055463 (FLEISCHMANN LEWIS W [US]) [A] 12* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0042]; figure - *; | [Y]WO2017185127 (SCHMETZER IND HOLDINGS PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 5,8-10 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0075]; figure - * | by applicant | US2013228308 | ES2558902 | - WAQAS A., "Thermal management of conventional PV panel using PCM with movable shutters. A numerical study", Solar Energy, (20171200), vol. 158, doi:doi:10.1016/j.solener.2017.10.050, pages 797 - 807, XP085289564 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solener.2017.10.050 | - MEMONSHAZIM, "Phase change materials integrated in building walls: a state of the art review", Renewable and Sustainable Energy Reviews, (20140000), vol. 31, pages 870 - 906 | - IZQUIERDO-BARRIENTOS M.ABELMONTE J.FRODRIGUEZ - SANCHEZ DMOLINA A.EALMENDROS-LBANEZ J.A, "A numerical study of external Building wall containing phase change material (PCM", Applied thermal engineering, (20120000), vol. 47, pages 73 - 85 | - FATEH AKLINKER FBRUTTING MWEINLADER HDEVIA F, "Numerical and Experimental investigation of an insulation layer with PCMs", Energy and Buildings, (20170000), vol. 153, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enbuild.2017.08.007, pages 231 - 240, XP085194100 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enbuild.2017.08.007 | - KOTTEK MGRIESER JBECK CRUDOLF BRUBEL F, "World map of the Koppen-Geiger climate classification updated", Meteorol. Zeitschrift, (20060000), vol. 15, pages 259 - 63 | ES20180030915 |