Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3853422
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.06.2023 |
First examination report |
|
03.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
26.11.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
29.10.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.06.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
01.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
07.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|