Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3853422 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75397 | 20.09.2019 | ES201830915 | 21.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020058500 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201830915 | 21.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2749756 | 28.01.2021 | B2 | ES2749756 | 23.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201830915 | 21.09.2018 |