Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3869999 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2023 | B1 | EP3869999 | 01.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP76703 | 02.10.2019 | IT201800010706 | 29.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3869999T | 08.05.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP76703 | 02.10.2019 | IT201800010706 | 29.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020108829 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800010706 | 29.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201800010706 | 29.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800010706 | 29.11.2018 |