EP3849674 - NON-FRANGIBLE THERMALLY RESPONSIVE FLUID CONTROL ASSEMBLIES FOR AUTOMATIC CORROSION RESISTANT SPRINKLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimax Viking Patent Management GmbH Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2024/44] |
Former [2021/29] | For all designated states Minimax Viking Research & Development GmbH Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Andrew, T. 1375 River Road Hastings, MI 49058 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19778717.9 | 12.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50751 | Priority number, date | US201862731679P | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862731679 P | US201962800020P | 01.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962800020 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020056091 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3849674 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/12, A62C37/50 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
A62C37/12 (EP,US);
A62C37/50 (EP);
A62C37/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | NICHT ZERBRECHLICHE, THERMISCH EMPFINDLICHE FLUIDSTEUERVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR AUTOMATISCHE KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE SPRINKLER | [2021/29] | English: | NON-FRANGIBLE THERMALLY RESPONSIVE FLUID CONTROL ASSEMBLIES FOR AUTOMATIC CORROSION RESISTANT SPRINKLERS | [2021/29] | French: | ENSEMBLES COMMANDE DE FLUIDE SENSIBLES À LA CHALEUR, NON CASSANTS, DESTINÉS À DES GICLEURS D'INCENDIE RÉSISTANTS À LA CORROSION | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191025349 (MOIR WILLIAM [IN]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 35 * * figures 1-12 *; | [X]GB1511802 (GRUNAU CO INC) [X] 1 * page 1, line 92 - page 4, line 90 * * figures 1-9 *; | [XDI]US4623023 (RETZLOFF JAMES G [US], et al) [XD] 1-10,15,16,18,19,21-25 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 19 * * figures 1-2 * [I] 11-14,17,20,26-30; | [X]WO2008067421 (TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-11 * * abstract ** the whole document *; | [X]WO2014047485 (TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP [US]) [X] 1 * page 9, paragraph 26 - page 24, paragraph 50 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO2016019392 (RELIABLE AUTO SPRINKLER CO [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 1-14 *; | [X]US2018133725 (SILVA JR MANUEL R [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US4623023 |