EP3841647 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE GRID STATE OF A LOW-VOLTAGE GRID OF AN ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANAK, Peter Nussdorferstr. 40/1/7 1090 Wien / AT | 02 /
SILJAK, Nedzad Siegfriedgasse 1 /124 1210 Wien / AT | 03 /
WÖHRER, Andreas Haffnergasse 91/14 1220 Wien / AT | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19778821.9 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019EP74200 | Priority number, date | EP20180196785 | 26.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18196785 | [2021/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020064331 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841647 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J13/00, G05B23/02, H04B3/54, G01R31/08 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G01R19/2513 (EP);
G05B23/0205 (EP);
H02J13/00006 (EP);
H02J3/00 (EP);
H04B3/54 (EP);
G01R31/085 (EP);
H02J2203/20 (EP);
H04B2203/5433 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES NETZZUSTANDES EINES NIEDERSPANNUNGSNETZES EINES ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEMS | [2021/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE GRID STATE OF A LOW-VOLTAGE GRID OF AN ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER L'ÉTAT D'UN RÉSEAU BASSE TENSION D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2608417 (POWER PLUS COMMUNICATIONS AG [DE]) [X] 4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 1-3; | [XA]US2014278162 (RILEY JR GLEN M [US], et al) [X] 4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-11 * [A] 1-3; | [IA]US2016127242 (BERNHEIM HENRIK FERNAND [US], et al) [I] 4 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0270]; figures 1-15 *[A] 1-3; | [XA] - RAKESH RAO ET AL, "Power line carrier (PLC) signal analysis of smart meters for outlier detection", SMART GRID COMMUNICATIONS (SMARTGRIDCOMM), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111017), doi:10.1109/SMARTGRIDCOMM.2011.6102335, ISBN 978-1-4577-1704-8, pages 291 - 296, XP032073387 [X] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1-3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SmartGridComm.2011.6102335 | by applicant | EP2608417 | US2014278162 |