EP3834373 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONFIGURING A SYSTEM, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/24] | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONFIGURING A SYSTEM, SYSTEM, COMPUTER PROGRAMME, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | ||
[2023/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBRECHT, Harald Gleiwitzer Str. 555 90475 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
HÖME, Stephan Dr.-Gustav-Heinemann-Str. 26 91126 Schwabach / DE | 03 /
TALANIS, Thomas Adenauerstr. 22 91336 Heroldsbach / DE | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 19779390.4 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019EP74941 | Priority number, date | EP20180200134 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18200134 | [2021/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074225 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834373 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3834373 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/08, G06F9/455, H04L67/12 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H04L41/0886 (EP,US);
H04L41/0843 (US);
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L41/0889 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | H04L12/24, G06F9/455, H04L29/08, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN KONFIGURIEREN EINES SYSTEMS, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2023/09] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONFIGURING A SYSTEM, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN SYSTÈME, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/09] |
Former [2021/24] | VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN KONFIGURIEREN EINES SYSTEMS, SYSTEM, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/24] | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY CONFIGURING A SYSTEM, SYSTEM, COMPUTER PROGRAMME, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/24] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN SYSTÈME, SYSTÈME, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 10.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 18.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | GB | 26.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 18.09.2023 | ||
GB | 26.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]CN108282376 (UNIV JIANGNAN) [X] 1,7-12,18-24 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0011] * [A] 6,17 [I] 2-5,13-16; | [A]US2018287883 (JOSHI PRABODH [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040] - [0048] , [0056] *; | [XAI] - VAN ROSSEM STEVEN ET AL, "NFV service dynamicity with a DevOps approach: Insights from a use-case realization", 2017 IFIP/IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON INTEGRATED NETWORK AND SERVICE MANAGEMENT (IM), IFIP, (20170508), doi:10.23919/INM.2017.7987357, pages 674 - 679, XP033127640 [X] 1,7-12,18-24 * Kapitel I, II und IV * [A] 6,17 [I] 2-5,13-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/INM.2017.7987357 | [A] - Ahmed Elgamil, "Templating your Dockerfile like a boss!", (20161229), URL: https://blog.dockbit.com/templating-your-dockerfile-like-a-boss-2a84a67d28e9, (20190409), XP055579167 [A] 1-24 * page 3 - page 6 * | [A] - Mark Church, "Docker Reference Architecture: Designing Scalable, Portable Docker Container Networks", (20170620), pages 1 - 37, URL: https://success.docker.com/api/articles/networking/pdf, (20180913), XP055507040 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2940972 | EP3062490 | EP3091714 | EP3267351 | EP20180192748 |