EP3850374 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING ACCELEROMETER ORIENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Mobility Solutions B.V. Beethovenstraat 503 1083 HK Amsterdam / NL | [2022/46] |
Former [2021/29] | For all designated states Webfleet Solutions B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARENZ, Martin De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
MEISSNER, Christian De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19779762.4 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP74691 | Priority number, date | GB20180014966 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: GB 201814966 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020053444 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850374 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3850374 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01P21/00, G01P15/18 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G01P15/18 (EP,US);
G01P21/00 (EP);
G01S19/52 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ORIENTIERUNG EINES BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSERS | [2021/29] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING ACCELEROMETER ORIENTATION | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ORIENTATION D'ACCÉLÉROMÈTRE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 13.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0017607 (MAGELLAN DIS INC [US]) [X] 1,11,13,16 * page 3, line 19 - page 10, line 2; figures 1-8b * [I] 2,7,12; | [XI]WO2014177888 (REDTAIL TELEMATICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,11-14,16 * page 9, line 29 - page 26, line 16; figures 1-7 * [I] 5,7-10,15; | [XI]US2015233718 (GROKOP LEONARD H [US]) [X] 1,11-13,16 * page 2, paragraph 30 - page 9, paragraph 126; figures 1-9 * [I] 2,7; | [XI]US9958473 (SLJIVAR SLAVEN [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13,16 * page 6, line 22 - page 14, line 37; figures 1-4c *[I] 2,7,12 | by applicant | WO2011003461 |