EP4034768 - INTEGRATED MOTOR-COMPRESSOR UNIT HAVING A COOLING CIRCUIT AND A DEPRESSURIZATION SYSTEM CONFIGURED TO REDUCE PRESSURE OF THE COOLING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermodyn 480, allée Gustave Eiffel 71200 Le Creusot / FR | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFOY, Benjamin c/o Thermodyn 480, allée Gustave Eiffel 71200 Le Creusot / FR | 02 /
GUILLEMIN, Sylvain c/o Thermodyn 480, allée Gustave Eiffel 71200 Le Creusot / FR | 03 /
ALBAN, Thomas c/o Thermodyn 480, allée Gustave Eiffel 71200 Le Creusot / FR | 04 /
NAWROCKI, Gilles c/o Thermodyn 480, allée Gustave Eiffel 71200 Le Creusot / FR | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/31] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Baker Hughes 245 Hammersmith Chalk Hill Road London W6 8DW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19780025.3 | 23.09.2019 | [2022/31] | WO2019IB58026 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058995 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034768 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4034768 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D17/10, F04D25/06, F04D29/58, F04D17/12 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
F04D29/5806 (EP,US);
F04D17/12 (EP,US);
F04D25/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE MOTORKOMPRESSOREINHEIT MIT EINEM KÜHLKREISLAUF UND EINEM DRUCKENTLASTUNGSSYSTEM ZUM REDUZIEREN DES DRUCKES DES KÜHLFLUIDS | [2022/31] | English: | INTEGRATED MOTOR-COMPRESSOR UNIT HAVING A COOLING CIRCUIT AND A DEPRESSURIZATION SYSTEM CONFIGURED TO REDUCE PRESSURE OF THE COOLING FLUID | [2022/31] | French: | UNITÉ DE MOTEUR-COMPRESSEUR INTÉGRÉE AYANT UN CIRCUIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET UN SYSTÈME DE DÉPRESSURISATION CONÇU POUR RÉDUIRE LA PRESSION DU FLUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 04.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007271956 (SMITH STEPHEN H [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2014130530 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 8,10,11,14,15 *; | [A]WO2017017202 (NUOVO PIGNONE TECNOLOGIE SRL [IT]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 24 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US9200643 |