EP3751703 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18, Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Jiadong NO. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Jialiang NO. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
WAN, Shiming NO. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Yuqi NO. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19780568.2 | 04.04.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019CN81428 | Priority number, date | CN201810299725 | 04.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810299725 | [2020/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019192586 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751703 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/10, H02J50/80, H02J50/12, H04B5/00, H04L29/08, H04M1/72412, H04W4/80, H04W8/24, H04W76/10, // H02J50/20 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/00 (CN);
H02J50/80 (EP,CN,US);
B64C27/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06F11/1479 (CN,US);
H02J50/10 (EP);
H02J50/20 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/00032 (US);
H02J7/00034 (CN,US);
H02J7/02 (US);
H04B5/00 (EP);
H04B5/72 (EP,CN,US);
H04B5/79 (CN,US);
H04L67/06 (CN);
H04M1/72412 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | H02J50/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -EINRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/51] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2020 | Translation filed | 09.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 06.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3068087 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD [CN]); | [XYI]KR20160124637 (POWELENG CO LTD [KR]); | [E]EP3591854 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) | International search | [X]CN204290445U (LIN GU); | [Y]CN204290445U (LIN GU); | [Y]CN106302589 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD ); | [A]US9685814 (MOYER TODD K [US], et al); | [PX]CN108695998 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) |