EP3780177 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITOU Motoharu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OGASAWARA Takeshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
AOKI Yoshinori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TSUJI Tomoki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19780995.7 | 20.02.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP06378 | Priority number, date | JP20180071818 | 03.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018071818 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019193857 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780177 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, C01G53/00, H01M4/36, H01M4/131, // H01M10/0525, H01M4/02 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
C01G53/42 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/38 (US);
H01M4/623 (US);
H01M4/625 (US);
C01P2004/20 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/027 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H01M4/525, C01G53/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2021/07] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/07] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | Translation filed | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/44] | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2015093580 (KOBAYASHI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 0042 - page 13, paragraph 0108; figures 1-13; tables 1,2 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US2017250396 (HIRATSUKA HIDEKAZU [JP]) [Y] 4* page 1, paragraph 0007 - page 8, paragraph 0105 *; | [XY] - ZHEN WANG ET AL, "Hierarchical LiNi 0.8 Co 0.15 Al 0.05 O 2 plates with exposed {010} active planes as a high performance cathode material for Li-ion batteries", RSC ADVANCES, (20160322), vol. 6, no. 38, doi:10.1039/C6RA02694J, pages 32365 - 32369, XP055740756 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 32365, paragraph Experimental - page 32368, paragraph Conclusions; figure 1c * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6RA02694J | [XY] - ZHANG CHI ET AL, "Facile synthesis silkworm-like Ni-rich layered LiNi0.8Co0.1Mn0.1O2cathode material for lithium-ion batteries", MATERIALS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170427), vol. 201, doi:10.1016/J.MATLET.2017.04.121, ISSN 0167-577X, pages 1 - 4, XP085028428 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph Experimental - page 4, paragraph Conclusions; figures 2a,2b * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matlet.2017.04.121 | International search | [Y]WO2014103166 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 4; | [A]JP2018014326 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [A] 1-4; | [A]KR100820057B (L & F CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4 * Example1, Figures3a-3c * | [XY] - WANG, Z. et al., "Hierarchical LiNi0.8Co0.15Al0.05O2 plates with exposed {010} active planes as a high performance cathode material for Li-ion batteries", RSC Advances, (20160322), vol. 6, no. 38, pages 32365 - 32369, XP055740756 [X] 1-3 * , Fig. 1(c) * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6RA02694J | by applicant | JP5876739B | JPS6030546B |