EP3758824 - SEPARATION OF MINERALS BY SPECIFIC GRAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robbins, Jody G. 1204 East Mescal Street Phoenix, AZ 85020 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANTULOK, Joseph, R. 1204 East Mescal Street Phoenix, Arizona 85020 / US | 02 /
ROBBINS, Jody, G. 1204 East Mescal Street Phoenix, Arizona 85020 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19781454.4 | 03.04.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US25660 | Priority number, date | US201862652494P | 04.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862652494 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019195475 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3758824 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B03B5/32, B04B3/06, B04B5/10, B04B11/04 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
B04B3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B03B5/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D21/262 (KR,US);
B03B5/442 (US);
B04B11/043 (EP);
B04B11/06 (KR,US);
B04B5/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B01D17/02, B03B5/56, B03B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | TRENNUNG VON MINERALIEN DURCH SPEZIFISCHE SCHWERKRAFT | [2021/01] | English: | SEPARATION OF MINERALS BY SPECIFIC GRAVITY | [2021/01] | French: | SÉPARATION DE MINÉRAUX PAR DENSITÉ RELATIVE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 13.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE766260 (KUERTH RUDOLF) [X] 1-4,8,9,13,14 * page 1 - page 2, line 36; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]GB2177948 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC) [Y] 11,12* figures 8,9 *; | [XY]WO2017143450 (SEPRO MINERAL SYSTEMS CORP [CA]) [X] 1,5-10,13,15 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figures 3-13; claim - * [Y] 11,12 | International search | [A]US4401437 (POETSCHKE LEONARD E [CA], et al) [A] 4 * Abstract, col 7 In 60-64; col 8 In 14-16; col 13 In 5-8. *; | [A]US4556467 (KUHN MARTIN C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * Entire Document. *; | [YA]US4799920 (MOZLEY RICHARD H [GB]) [Y] 1-5, 7-12 * Abstract, col 3 In 5-11; col 5 In 16-49; col 6 In 10-19; col 6 In 53-54; col 7 In 11-19; Figure 1; Figure 2; and Figure 3. * [A] 6; | [A]WO9527551 (UNIV MISSISSIPPI [US], et al) [A] 3 * Abstract, pg 4 In 19-20. *; | [YA]US5577669 (VUJNOVIC J BRADLEY [US]) [Y] 1-5, 7-12 * Abstract, col 2 In 14-19; col 3 In 16-18; col 5 In 12-15. * [A] 6; | [A]US2003056584 (PARK TAE-WON [KR]) [A] 11-12 * Abstract, para [0016], [0083], and Figure 3. *; | [A]US2012145633 (POLIZZOTTI DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-12* Entire Document. *; | [Y]US2013252796 (VON STETTEN FELIX [DE], et al) [Y] 10 * Abstract, para [0088], [0123], Figure 4D; and Figure 7. *; | [A]US9302270 (ROTHMAN PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 7 * Abstract, col 2 In 10-17; and col 3 In 29-33. * | by applicant | DE766260 | WO2017143450 |