EP3791575 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING 360-DEGREE VIDEO, METHOD FOR RECEIVING 360-DEGREE VIDEO, APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING 360-DEGREE VIDEO, AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING 360-DEGREE VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07336 SEOUL / KR | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Hyunmook IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
OH, Sejin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19782005.3 | 03.04.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019KR03939 | Priority number, date | US201862653527P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653527 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019194573 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791575 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/117, H04N13/161, H04N13/178, H04N13/194, H04N21/218, H04N21/2343, H04N21/4402, H04N21/81, H04N21/845, H04N21/854 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H04N13/117 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/111 (KR);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/349 (KR);
H04N21/21805 (EP);
H04N21/23439 (EP);
H04N21/44029 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | H04N13/194, H04N13/111, H04N13/178, H04N13/349, H04N21/81 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN EINES 360-GRAD-VIDEOS, VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES 360-GRAD-VIDEOS, VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN EINES 360-GRAD-VIDEOS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES 360-GRAD-VIDEOS | [2021/11] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING 360-DEGREE VIDEO, METHOD FOR RECEIVING 360-DEGREE VIDEO, APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING 360-DEGREE VIDEO, AND APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING 360-DEGREE VIDEO | [2021/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE VIDÉO À 360 DEGRÉS, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE VIDÉO À 360 DEGRÉS, APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE VIDÉO À 360 DEGRÉS, ET APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION DE VIDÉO À 360 DEGRÉS | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 26.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018061002 (LEE JANGWON [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0465]; claim 12 * [I] 5,11; | [X]US2018077451 (YIP ERIC [KR], et al) [X] 1,7,12,13 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0151] *; | [A] - "Revised text of ISO/IEC FDIS 23090-2 Omnidirectional Media Format", no. n17399, (20180228), 121. MPEG MEETING; 20180122 - 20180126; GWANGJU; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/121_Gwangju/wg11/w17399-v2-w17399.zip w17399 revised text FDIS 23090-2 OMAF v2 clean.docx, (20180228), XP030024044 [A] 5,11 * paragraph [7.5.3] * | International search | [A]KR20090123743 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0217]-[0221]; and figure 22. *; | [Y]US2017294049 (ZHOU CHANGYIN [US]) [Y] 2-4, 9-10, 15 * See paragraphs [0032], [0061]. *; | [Y]WO2017204491 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0094], [0264]-[0265], [0423]; and claim 13. *; | [A]WO2017205794 (VID SCALE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0004]-[0013]. *; | [Y] - R. SKUPIN et al., "Standardization status of 360 degree video coding and delivery", 2017 IEEE Visual Communications and Image Processing (VCIP, St. Petersburg , FL, USA, (20171210), pages 1 - 4, XP055457376 [Y] 1-15 * See sections II-III. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VCIP.2017.8305083 | by applicant | US2008077451 | US2018061002 |