EP3773040 - HELMET ACCESSORY MOUNT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentex Corporation 324 Main Street Simpson, PA 18407 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'CONNELL, Jason, W. 965 King Street Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19782071.5 | 05.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US26111 | Priority number, date | US201862653034P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653034 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019195760 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773040 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A42B1/00, A42B1/24, A42B3/00, A42B3/04, G02B23/12, G02B23/18 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A42B3/042 (EP);
A42B1/24 (IL);
A42B3/0406 (US);
A42B3/00 (IL);
A42B3/04 (EP,IL);
G02B23/125 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A42B1/00, A42B1/24, A42B3/00, A42B3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR HELMZUBEHÖR | [2021/07] | English: | HELMET ACCESSORY MOUNT SYSTEM | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE D'ACCESSOIRE DE CASQUE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012002046 (RAPOPORT LOREN W [US], et al); | [X]US9781963 (CELONA MARC J [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4449787 (BURBO JAMES H [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [XA]US2012002046 (RAPOPORT LOREN W [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-11, 14-19 * , entire document, especially Fig 1A-1G; para [0004]; para [0014]; para [0015]; para [0016] * [A] 9, 12-13; | [A]US8209780 (LEMIRE GARY M [US]) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [A]US9781963 (CELONA MARC J [US], et al) [A] 1-19* , entire document * | by applicant | US7849517 | US9781963 | WO2018US22221 |