EP3735798 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENTLY PROVIDING ACCESS CONTROL CONFIGURATION INFORMATION IN NEXT-GENERATION WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sangbum 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
SAYENKO, Alexander 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
JIN, Seungri 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
VAN DER VELDE, Himke 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 19782127.5 | 04.04.2019 | [2020/46] | WO2019KR04009 | Priority number, date | KR20180039855 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180039855 | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019194605 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3735798 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/02, H04W48/12 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W72/53 (KR);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W84/042 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EFFIZIENTEN BEREITSTELLUNG VON ZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNGSKONFIGURATIONSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION | [2020/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENTLY PROVIDING ACCESS CONTROL CONFIGURATION INFORMATION IN NEXT-GENERATION WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2020/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE EFFICACE D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE CONFIGURATION DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016006980 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | International search | [A]US2017257791 (RAJADURAI RAJAVELSAMY [IN], et al); | by applicant | WO2016006980 |