EP3749195 - HIGH DENSITY ELECTRODE MAPPING CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Cardiology Division, Inc. 177 East County Road B St. Paul, MN 55117 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOTH, Eric, J. 2968 Edward Street Maplewood, MN 55109 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Gregory, K. 18004 Kent Street NW Elk River, MN 55330 / US | 03 /
MONAHAN, Brian, M. 12488 194th Lane NW Elk River, MN 55330 / US | [2023/42] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
VOTH, Eric, J. 2968 Edward Street Maple-wood, MN 55109 / US | ||
02 /
OLSON, Gregory, K. 18004 Kent Street NW Elk River, MN 55330 / US | |||
03 /
MONAHAN, Brian, M. 12488 194th Lane NW Elk River, MN 55330 / US | Representative(s) | Alpspitz IP Longinusstraße 1 81247 München / DE | [2023/42] |
Former [2020/51] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19782413.9 | 03.04.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019US25604 | Priority number, date | US201862653031P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653031 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019195439 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749195 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749195 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B18/14, A61M25/00, A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/287 (EP);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/6859 (EP);
A61B2018/00077 (US);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1467 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1497 (EP);
A61B2505/05 (EP);
A61B2562/0209 (EP);
A61B2562/028 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | A61B5/042, A61B5/00, A61B18/14, A61M25/00, A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHETER ZUM HOCHDICHTEN ELEKTRODEN-MAPPING | [2020/51] | English: | HIGH DENSITY ELECTRODE MAPPING CATHETER | [2020/51] | French: | CATHÉTER DE CARTOGRAPHIE À ÉLECTRODES HAUTE DENSITÉ | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.04.2023 | 25.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5788692 (CAMPBELL THOMAS H [US], et al); | [X]WO2012145077 (TOPERA INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2014113612 (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US]); | [Y]US2018042506 (LOCKE BENJAMIN [US], et al) | International search | [A]US6071282 (FLEISCHMAN SIDNEY D [US]); | [A]WO2014113612 (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US]); | [A]US2014296849 (COE JONATHAN ALLEN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2016090175 (METAVENTION INC [US]); | [YX]US2017112404 (DE LA RAMA ALAN [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2012145077 | WO2014113612 | US2017042449 | US9808171 | US19860625721 | WO2014US11940 |