EP3779031 - HIGH-DENSITY WOVEN FABRIC AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiber Inc. 234-1, Aza Mizukami Kakuganji Tsuruoka-shi, Yamagata 997-0052 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Atsushi c/o Spiber Inc., 234-1, Aza Mizukami, Kakuganji Tsuruoka-shi, Yamagata 997-0052 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Handley, Matthew Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19782456.8 | 03.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP14897 | Priority number, date | JP20180071892 | 03.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018071892 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019194262 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779031 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06M11/01, D01F4/02, D03D15/00, D06B5/00, D03D13/00, D03D15/233, D03D15/567, D06C7/02, D06M11/05, D03D15/41, D06M15/70, D06C29/00, C07K14/435 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
D06M11/05 (EP);
D03D15/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/43518 (EP);
C07K14/43586 (EP);
D01D10/00 (EP);
D01F4/02 (EP);
D01F6/90 (EP);
D02J1/22 (EP);
D03D13/008 (EP);
D03D15/233 (EP);
D03D15/41 (EP,US);
D03D15/567 (EP);
D06M15/70 (EP);
D02G3/02 (EP);
D06C29/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | D06M11/01, D01F4/02, D03D15/00, D06B5/00, D03D13/00, D03D15/233, D03D15/567, D06C7/02, D06M11/05, D03D15/41 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | D06M11/01, D01F4/02, D03D15/00, D06B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | GEWEBE MIT HOHER DICHTE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2021/07] | English: | HIGH-DENSITY WOVEN FABRIC AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2021/07] | French: | TEXTILE TISSÉ À HAUTE DENSITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | Translation filed | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2023 | Observations by third parties | 21.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU711198 ; | [X]GB904597 (FRANCOIS MASUREL FRERES ETS); | [X]US3266865 (RUNTON LESLIE A); | [X]GB1255608 (WOOL IND RES ASSOCIATION); | [A]JPH01183534 (MIZUSHIMA SHIGESABURO, et al); | [A]JPH01306641 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, et al); | [A]JPH08134770 (KANEBO LTD); | [XY]JP2000248441 (UNITIKA LTD); | [X]JP2000303307 (KANEBO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2001192946 (TEIJIN SHOJI CO LTD, et al); | [Y]WO03020916 (UNIV WYOMING [US], et al); | [X]JP2009155774 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, et al); | [X]KR20160080605 (KYUNGPOOK NAT UNIV IND ACAD [KR]); | [Y]WO2017188434 (SPIBER INC [JP], et al); | [XP]EP3323307 (ADIDAS AG [DE]); | [XP]WO2018165595 (BOLT THREADS INC [US]); | [E]EP3808882 (HASETORA SPINNING CO LTD [JP], et al); | International search | [X]JP6213C (SAKANE, Kiyoichi) [X] 1-6, 8-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [X]JP111700C (KENGYO SIKENSHOCHO) [X] 1-6, 8-11 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [X]JPH07252746 (TAKADA TORU, et al) [X] 1-6, 8-11 * , claims, examples, fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [X]JPH0931798 (TAKADA TORU, et al) [X] 1-6, 8-11 * , claims, paragraph [0008], fig. 1 *; | [XY]WO2013147590 (ESSAIDI JALILA [NL]) [X] 1-12, 17, 18 * , claims, pp. 6, 7, 9, 11, fig. 3-10 * [Y] 13-16; | [Y]WO2017188434 (SPIBER INC [JP], et al) [Y] 13-16* , claims, examples, fig. 1, paragraphs [0057], [0059] * | by applicant | JP2002238569 | JP2013209756 | - Nucleic Acid Res, (19820000), vol. 10, page 6487 | - Methods in Enzymology, (19830000), vol. 100, page 448 | - "GenBank Accession", Database accession no. AAA27840.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. G1: 24654243 | - KYTE JDOOLITTLE R, "A simple method for displaying the hydropathic character of a protein", J. Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 157, doi:10.1016/0022-2836(82)90515-0, pages 105 - 132, XP024014365 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(82)90515-0 | - OFFICE OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS REGULATION, "Notice No. 50 of the Office of Hazardous Materials Regulation", Test Method for Granular or Low-Melting-Point Synthetic Resin, (19950531), no. 50 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19720000), vol. 69, page 2110 | - Molecular Cloning |