EP4034408 - WHEEL DRIVE SHAFT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZACHRISSON, Jan Landstormsvägen 88 439 94 Onsala / SE | 02 /
ÖHRFELDT, Pär Tallgården 3 435 32 Mölnlycke / SE | 03 /
DAGH, Ingemar Skepparegången 8 413 18 Göteborg / SE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 19782522.7 | 26.09.2019 | [2022/31] | WO2019EP76087 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058106 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034408 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4034408 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/30 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B60K17/24 (EP,US);
F16D3/50 (EP,US);
B60K17/165 (EP,US);
F16D3/33 (US);
F16D2300/18 (US);
F16D3/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADANTRIEBSWELLENANORDNUNG | [2022/31] | English: | WHEEL DRIVE SHAFT ARRANGEMENT | [2022/31] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ARBRE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE ROUE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 25.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | IE | 26.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | GB | 19.10.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
IE | 26.09.2023 | ||
GB | 19.10.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4079799 (SWAN TERRY D); | [XI]GB2015696 (GLAENZER SPICER SA); | [XI]US4697662 (ZOLLMEYER WILLI [DE], et al); | [XDI]EP0960761 (CARRARO SPA [IT]); | [A]US2005073122 (LEBLANC JAMES C [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0960761 |