EP3864234 - PEDESTAL FOR SUPPORTING AN ELEVATED SURFACE AND ASSEMBLY OF SUCH PEDESTALS AND AN ELEVATED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deceuninck NV Bruggesteenweg 360 8830 Hooglede-Gits / BE | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAERE, Pauline Bruggesteenweg 360 8830 Hooglede-Gits / BE | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | BiiP bv Engels Plein 3 bus 102 3000 Leuven / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | BiiP cvba Engels Plein 3 bus 102 3000 Leuven / BE | Application number, filing date | 19783064.9 | 10.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP77510 | Priority number, date | EP20180199696 | 10.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18199696 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074655 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864234 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3864234 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
E04F15/02044 (EP);
E04F15/02183 (EP);
E04F2015/02061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOCKEL ZUM TRAGEN EINER ERHÖHTEN OBERFLÄCHE UND ANORDNUNG SOLCHER SOCKEL UND EINER ERHÖHTEN OBERFLÄCHE | [2021/33] | English: | PEDESTAL FOR SUPPORTING AN ELEVATED SURFACE AND ASSEMBLY OF SUCH PEDESTALS AND AN ELEVATED SURFACE | [2021/33] | French: | SOCLE POUR SUPPORTER UNE SURFACE SURÉLEVÉE ET ENSEMBLE DE TELS SOCLES ET SURFACE SURÉLEVÉE | [2022/50] |
Former [2021/33] | SOCLE SUPPORTANT UNE SURFACE SURÉLEVÉE, ASSEMBLAGE DE TELS SOCLES ET D'UNE SURFACE SURÉLEVÉE | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | LU | 10.10.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | DK | 05.04.2023 | |
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | DK | 05.04.2023 | |
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | DK | 05.04.2023 | |
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 05.04.2023 | |
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 05.04.2023 | |
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 05.04.2023 | |
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 05.04.2023 | |
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 05.04.2023 | |
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 05.04.2023 | |
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 07.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US8820011 (PARKS STEVEN A [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 11 *; | [AD]DE102013019133 (RENSBURG MARKUS [DE]) [AD] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [A]EP2878743 (KUIJPER MODELL UND FORMENBAU GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3, 4, 8 * | by applicant | DE102013109845 | DE102013019133 | DE202015008251U |