EP3863978 - ROLLER BED FOR GLASS PANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 12 Place de l'Iris Tour Saint-Gobain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMANTIER, Arthur Burtscheider Str. 29 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
ZEICHNER, Achim Grachtstraße 30 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | 03 /
HIS, Christian 169, impasse des capucinnes 84300 Cavaillon / FR | 04 /
VILLERMAUX, Franceline 14bis rue et place des Etudes 84000 Avignon / FR | 05 /
MARINHA, Daniel 5, rue de la Porte Évêque 84000 Avignon / FR | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte mbB Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19783324.7 | 09.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP77398 | Priority number, date | EP20180200125 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18200125 | [2021/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074603 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863978 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03B35/16, C03B35/18 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C03B35/181 (EP);
C03B35/165 (EP);
C03B35/186 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Validation states | MA | 30.03.2021 | Title | German: | ROLLENBETT FÜR GLASSCHEIBEN | [2021/33] | English: | ROLLER BED FOR GLASS PANES | [2021/33] | French: | LIT À ROULEAUX POUR PLAQUES DE VERRE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE2719898 (KOPPERS WISTRA OFENBAU GMBH) [I] 1-15 * figures 2,3 *; | [I]EP0010233 (SELAS CORP OF AMERICA [US]) [I] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [I]US4297121 (RHONEHOUSE DONALD E) [I] 1-15* figures 3,4 *; | [I]EP0310500 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [I]US4991275 (ADAMS SR JAMES H [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 45 - line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [I]DE9306007U (LWK PLASMACERAMIC INTERNATIONA [LU]) [I] 1-15 * figures 4,2 *; | [YD]DE102009018822 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE], et al) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0013]; figure 1 *; | [I]DE102010017530 (ROTH & RAU AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [YD]US9758421 (SCHNABEL JR JAMES P [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [ID]DE102016206111 (SKF AB [SE]) [ID] 1-15 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE102009018822 | US9758421 | DE102016206111 |