EP3866977 - SAMPLE PREPARATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Maastricht Minderbroedersberg 4-6 6211 LK Maastricht / NL | For all designated states Academisch ziekenhuis Maastricht P. Debyelaan 25 6229 HX Maastricht / NL | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEEREN, Ronald Martinus Alexander Wiefferingdreef 12 1383 CC Weesp / NL | 02 /
CREISSEN, Alain Vincent Jacques P.O. Box 16007 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 03 /
LAEVEN, Paul Frans Jozef Rott 33 6194 NL Vijlen / NL | 04 /
SMEETS, Lars Catharina Pascal Marie Koenenhof 22 6243 CK Geulle / NL | 05 /
HUYSMANS, Pascal Paul Marie Groene Specht 7 6245 RK Eijsden / NL | 06 /
HUIZING, Lennart Randolf Sibren Bilzerbaan 87/01 3620 Veldwezelt / BE | 07 /
ELLIS, Shane Raymond 20 McMahon Street Fairy Meadow, NSW, 2519 / AU | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19783539.0 | 10.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP77514 | Priority number, date | EP20180200471 | 15.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18200471 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078830 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866977 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L9/00, H01J49/04, B05D3/10, B05D7/00, B05D1/00, G01N1/31, G01N1/44 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B01L9/52 (EP);
G01N1/31 (EP);
G01N1/44 (EP);
B01L2200/0678 (EP);
B01L2300/1827 (EP);
B01L2400/049 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | PROBENHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/34] | English: | SAMPLE PREPARATION APPARATUS | [2021/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH1025563 (SHINKO SEIKI) [X] 1-4,7,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0 49] - [0056] - [0119]; figures 1-4 * [I] 1-15; | [I]EP0997552 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1,3,7,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0037]; figures 1,2 *; | [ID]EP2975393 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) [ID] 1-8,13-15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0061]; figure 5 *; | [A]KR101814390B (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0049] - [0051]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP2975393 |