EP3861553 - INFUSION PUMP AND INFUSION PUMP OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURISET, Angela, Teresa 5851 Chatham Drive Hoffman Estates, IL 60192 / US | 02 /
ROUSH, Thomas, Benjamin 9020 N. Maryland Street Niles, IL 60714 / US | 03 /
GIBSON, Madeleine, Clare 940 Jenifer Street Madison, WI 53703 / US | 04 /
ARGERSINGER, Andrew, Scott 8667 Chaucer Circle West Bristol, WI 53104 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | Bettridge, Paul Sebastian Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19783823.8 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US52579 | Priority number, date | US201862740592P | 03.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740592 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072235 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861553 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/17, A61M5/172, G16H40/63 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
A61M5/172 (US);
A61M5/14212 (EP);
A61M5/14244 (EP);
A61M5/16877 (EP);
A61M5/1723 (EP);
G16H40/40 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2205/33 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6009 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | INFUSIONSPUMPE UND INFUSIONSPUMPENBETRIEB | [2021/32] | English: | INFUSION PUMP AND INFUSION PUMP OPERATIONS | [2021/32] | French: | POMPE À PERFUSION ET FONCTIONNEMENTS DE POMPE À PERFUSION | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008071209 (MOUBAYED AHMAD-MAHER [US], et al); | [I]US2014365941 (JOGLEKAR AJINKYA M [US], et al) |