EP3776456 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIGNALING AND STORING GROUPING TYPES IN AN IMAGE CONTAINER FILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKSU, Emre Virrenkatu 3 D 20 33800 Tampere / FI | 02 /
HANNUKSELA, Miska Rusthollinrinne 2 33610 Tampere / FI | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 19785049.8 | 05.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019FI50273 | Priority number, date | US201862655991P | 11.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862655991 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197718 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776456 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50, G06T7/00, H04N19/30, H04N21/23 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04N21/23 (EP);
H04N21/8153 (EP,US);
G06F16/51 (US);
H04N21/4312 (US);
H04N21/4342 (US);
H04N21/85406 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALISIERUNG UND SPEICHERUNG VON GRUPPIERUNGSTYPEN IN EINER BILDBEHÄLTERDATEI | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIGNALING AND STORING GROUPING TYPES IN AN IMAGE CONTAINER FILE | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SIGNALISATION ET DE STOCKAGE DE TYPES DE GROUPAGE DANS UN FICHIER CONTENEUR D'IMAGES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3107011 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-13,15 * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * * figure 4 * [I] 3,8,14; | [A] - "Draft of white paper on High Efficiency Image File Format", no. n15822, (20151023), 113. MPEG MEETING; 20151019 - 20151023; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/113_Geneva/wg11/w15822.zip w15822.doc, (20151023), XP030022498 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2017039686 (MIURA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0005], [0007]-[0008], [0022]-[0025], [0333], [0576] *; | [X] - HEIKKILA, L, "High Efficiency Image File Format implementation", Master of Science thesis, (20160504), XP55641996 [X] 1-16 * , Figures 3.3, 3.4, 4.5 * | [X] - Anonymous, Information technology - High efficiency coding and media delivery in heterogeneous environments - Part 12: Image File Format, (20171200), pages 1 - 72, XP009522782 [X] 1-16 * (especially 6.4.7), 9 * |