EP3776559 - METHODS SYSTEMS DEVICES CIRCUITS AND FUNCTIONALLY RELATED MACHINE EXECUTABLE INSTRUCTIONS FOR TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT NETWORK CYBERSECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cervello Ltd. 82 Yigal Alon St. Suzuki Tower 6789124 Tel Aviv / IL | [2023/46] |
Former [2023/35] | For all designated states Cervello Ltd. 94 Yigal Alon St., Alon Towers 2 6789156 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Cervello Ltd. 1 Simtat-HaYerek St. 4526470 Hod Hasharon / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAFZAN, Shaked 3 Brener St. 6382622 Tel-Aviv / IL | 02 /
ONN, Roie 6 Tor-HaZahav St. 4650208 Herzeliya / IL | 03 /
AVIDAN, Nadav 20 HaAlonim St. 4256532 Netanya / IL | 04 /
AHARON, Eitam 3 Ha-Meri St. 5329603 Givatayim / IL | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/07] | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 19785702.2 | 09.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019IB52916 | Priority number, date | US201862654558P | 09.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862654558 P | US201862668825P | 09.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862668825 P | US201862679991P | 04.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679991 P | US201862730559P | 13.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862730559 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019197989 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776559 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3776559 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/00, G06F21/50, G06F21/57, H04L41/28 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
B61L15/0018 (US);
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L63/0263 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | G06F21/00, G06F21/50, G06F21/57, H04L41/28 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | G16C10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN, SCHALTKREISE UND FUNKTIONSBEZOGENE MASCHINENAUSFÜHRBARE ANWEISUNGEN FÜR DIE CYBERSICHERHEIT EINES TRANSPORTMANAGEMENTNETZWERKS | [2021/07] | English: | METHODS SYSTEMS DEVICES CIRCUITS AND FUNCTIONALLY RELATED MACHINE EXECUTABLE INSTRUCTIONS FOR TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT NETWORK CYBERSECURITY | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES, DISPOSITIFS, CIRCUITS ET INSTRUCTIONS EXÉCUTABLES PAR MACHINE FONCTIONNELLEMENT ASSOCIÉES POUR LA CYBERSÉCURITÉ D'UN RÉSEAU DE GESTION DE TRANSPORT | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22168075.4 / EP4050502 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2016050222 (IYER SHANKAR RAMASUBRAMANIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 14 *[A] 2-10,12-15; | [YA]EP3151152 (SECURE-NOK AS [NO]) [Y] 1,11 * abstract * * column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * column 2, paragraph 9 * * column 3, paragraph 18 - column 4 * * column 10, paragraph 49 * [A] 2-10,13-15 | International search | [Y]WO03097425 (TMG INTERNAT HOLDINGS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 4-6, 14-16 * entire document *; | [A]US2009079560 (FRIES JEFFREY MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2010023598 (GINTER ANDREW [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US7983835 (LAGASSEY PAUL J [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [XY] - Cyrail, "CYbersecurity in the RAILway sector ", (20171116), pages 1 - 41, EU project 730843, URL: https://ec.europa.eu/research/participants/documents/downlaodPublic?documentlds=080166e5b678c2dc&appld=PPGMS, XP055645636 [X] 1-3, 7-13, 17-20 * entire document * [Y] 4-6, 14-16 | by applicant | US2016050222 | EP3151152 |