EP3783936 - CLOUD SIM CARD MANAGEMENT SERVER, BINDING APPARATUS, MANAGEMENT METHOD, BINDING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Ucloudlink New Technology Co., Ltd 3/F, Block A, Building 1 Shenzhen Software Industry Base Xuefu Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Zhihui 3/F, Block A, Building 1 Shenzhen Software Industry Base Xuefu Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Wen 3/F, Block A, Building 1 Shenzhen Software Industry Base Xuefu Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 19786151.1 | 05.01.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019CN70547 | Priority number, date | CN201810333213 | 13.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810333213 | [2021/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019196521 | Date: | 17.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783936 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, H04W8/20, H04W88/18 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
H04W8/205 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/18 (CN);
H04W8/183 (US);
H04W88/18 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | CLOUD-SERVER ZUR VERWALTUNG VON SIM-KARTEN, BINDEVORRICHTUNG, VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN, BINDEVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM | [2021/08] | English: | CLOUD SIM CARD MANAGEMENT SERVER, BINDING APPARATUS, MANAGEMENT METHOD, BINDING METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2021/08] | French: | SERVEUR DE GESTION DE CARTE SIM EN NUAGE, APPAREIL DE LIAISON, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE LIAISON | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2020 | Translation filed | 13.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 25.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]CN106604256 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-3,5-7,9 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0030] * [Y] 4,8; | [A]US2017170856 (SHEN XIAOJUN [CN]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027] *; | [XYI]CN107257555 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7,9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0144] * [Y] 4,8 [I] 2,6; | [A]US2018041893 (GUO GEORGE [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0056] * | International search | [A]US2011028126 (LIM HANNA [KR], et al) [A] 1-9* entire document *; | [A]US2013023235 (FAN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [A]CN103428696 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [A]CN103916844 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [A]CN106131814 (E-SURFING TELECOM TERMINAL CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [A]CN106162607 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [X]CN106454820 (SHENZHEN FUTAIHONG PREC IND CO, et al) [X] 1-9 * description, paragraphs [0029]-[0074], and figures 2-5 *; | [X]CN106878987 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [X] 1-9 * description, paragraphs [0057]-[0083] and [0118]-[0128], and figures 1, 2, and 6 *; | [PX]CN108769978 (SHENZHEN UCLOUDLINK TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-9 * entire document * |