EP3867194 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF SYNTHESIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTENSEN, Peter Mølgaard Tofteengen 27 4000 Roskilde / DK | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/34] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 19786529.8 | 08.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP77154 | Priority number, date | DK2018PA00726 | 15.10.2018 Original published format: DK PA201800726 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078764 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867194 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3867194 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38, C25B1/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C01B3/382 (EP);
C01B3/36 (US);
B01J19/2415 (US);
C07C29/1518 (US);
C25B1/00 (EP);
C25B1/02 (US);
C25B1/23 (US);
C25B15/081 (US);
C25B15/083 (US);
C01B2203/0216 (US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP);
C01B2203/0244 (EP);
C01B2203/061 (EP,US);
C01B2203/062 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0844 (EP,US);
C01B2203/141 (EP);
C01B2203/142 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP);
Y02P20/133 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SYNTHESEGAS | [2021/34] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF SYNTHESIS GAS | [2021/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 15.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003065042 (SHAW JOHN M [CA]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0088]; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2013345325 (LECOMTE MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0070]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2013345324 (KNUDSEN BJERG LARI [DK], et al) [Y] 3,10,11,13 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-5; claim 1 ** paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0112] *; | [Y]WO2017144403 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [Y] 1-14 * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 24; figures 1-2; claim 1 * |