EP3863965 - LIQUID-EXFOLIATED NANOMATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Material Development Limited Surrey Technology Centre 40 Occam Road Guildford Surrey GU2 7YG / GB | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALTON, Alan C/O Advanced Material Development Limited Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square, Falmer Brighton East Sussex BN1 9SB / GB | 02 /
LARGE, Matthew C/O Advanced Material Development Limited Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square, Falmer Brighton East Sussex BN1 9SB / GB | 03 /
OGILVIE, Sean C/O Advanced Material Development Limited Sussex Innovation Centre Science Park Square, Falmer Brighton East Sussex BN1 9SB / GB | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Bajjon, Alexander, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19786953.0 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP77579 | Priority number, date | EP20180200075 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18200075 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074698 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863965 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/19, C01B17/20 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C01B32/19 (EP,KR,US);
C01B21/0648 (EP,KR);
C01G39/06 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
C01P2004/24 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/62 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSABSCHÄLENDE NANOMATERIALIEN | [2021/33] | English: | LIQUID-EXFOLIATED NANOMATERIALS | [2021/33] | French: | NANOMATÉRIAUX EXFOLIÉS LIQUIDES | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014140324 (PROVOST FELLOWS & SCHOLARS COLLEGE OF THE HOLY UNDIVIDED TRINITY OF QUEEN ELIZABETH NEAR DUBLIN [IE]) [X] 1,4,16* Shear exfoliation of other layered compounds;; claim 1 *; | [XDI]WO2017089987 (FOND ST ITALIANO TECNOLOGIA [IT]) [XD] 1,4,9-13,16 * figures 1,2a; claim 1 * [I] 2,3,5-7; | [X]CN206970222U (CHENGDU NEW KELI CHEM SCI CO) [X] 16 * examples 1-3 * | by applicant | US7785492 | WO2012028724 | WO2014140324 | WO2017060497 | WO2017089987 | CN206970222U | US2018186643 |