EP3827479 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY PRODUCE CONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/22] | INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY ASSEMBLING LINES | ||
[2021/44] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEONI Bordnetz-Systeme GmbH Flugplatzstraße 74 97318 Kitzingen / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLD, Klaus Hittorfstrasse 20 42897 Remscheid / DE | 02 /
JAECKLEIN, Roland Erlachhof 4 97332 Volkach / DE | 03 /
KERBAUM, Marie An der Lehmgrube 6 97320 Buchbrunn / DE | 04 /
MARTINS, Paulo Im Richthofen Circle 4 97318 Kitzingen / DE | 05 /
TAVSEL, Onur Mergentheimer Strasse 58 97082 Würzburg / DE | [2022/02] |
Former [2021/22] | 01 /
HOLD, Klaus Hittorfstrasse 7 42897 Remscheid / DE | ||
02 /
JAECKLEIN, Roland Erlachhof 4 97332 Volkach / DE | |||
03 /
KERBAUM, Marie An der Lehmgrube 6 97320 Buchbrunn / DE | |||
04 /
MARTINS, Paulo Im Richthofen Circle 4 97318 Kitzingen / DE | |||
05 /
TAVSEL, Onur Mergentheimer Strasse 58 97082 Würzburg / DE | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19787155.1 | 23.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019DE200086 | Priority number, date | DE201810212462 | 26.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018212462 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020422 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827479 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827479 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/28, H01R43/052, H01R43/048, H01R3/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H01R43/052 (EP);
H01R43/0488 (EP);
H01R43/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | H01R3/00, H01R43/052, H01R43/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 18.02.2021 | TN | 18.02.2021 | Title | German: | ANLAGE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN KONFEKTIONIERUNG VON LEITUNGEN | [2021/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY PRODUCE CONDUCTORS | [2021/44] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN CABLE | [2021/44] |
Former [2021/22] | INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY ASSEMBLING LINES | ||
Former [2021/22] | INSTALLATION AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CONFECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE CONDUITES | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 25.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.2022
19.10.2022
ADMISSIBLE SCHLEUNIGER AG Bierigutstrasse 9 3608 Thun / CH Opponent's representative PPR AG BGZ Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.2022
19.10.2022
ADMISSIBLE SCHLEUNIGER AG Bierigutstrasse 9 3608 Thun / CH Opponent's representative Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ Rotenbodenstrasse 12 9497 Triesenberg / LI | 09.11.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2019 | AL | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | IE | 23.07.2022 | LU | 23.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 23.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 23.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 23.07.2022 | ||
LU | 23.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 23.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
LU | 23.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Cited in | Opposition | GB1028533 | EP0440955 | EP1073163 | DE102004061047 | US2018062340 |