EP3783016 - MODIFIED ANTIBODY AND RADIOACTIVE METAL-LABELLED ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Medi-Physics Co., Ltd 3-4-10, Shinsuna Koto-ku Tokyo, 136-0075 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Kagoshima University 21-24, Korimoto 1-chome Kagoshima-shi Kagoshima 890-8580 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Chiba University 1-33, Yayoi-cho Inage-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 263-8522 / JP | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMOTO Shota c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO., LTD., 3-4-10, Shinsuna, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0075 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA Yu c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO., LTD., 3-4-10, Shinsuna, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0075 / JP | 03 /
SHOYAMA Yoshinari c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO., LTD., 3-4-10, Shinsuna, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0075 / JP | 04 /
HATANO Tadashi c/o NIHON MEDI-PHYSICS CO., LTD., 3-4-10, Shinsuna, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0075 / JP | 05 /
ITO Yuji c/o National University Corporation Kagoshima University, 21-24, Korimoto 1-chome Kagoshima-shi, Kagoshima 890-8580 / JP | 06 /
ARANO Yasushi c/o Graduate School and Faculty of Pharmaceutical Sciences, Chiba University, 1-8-1, Inohana, Chuo- ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 260-0856 / JP | 07 /
SUZUKI Hiroyuki c/o Graduate School and Faculty of Pharmaceutical Sciences, Chiba University, 1-8-1, Inohana, Chuo- ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 260-0856 / JP | 08 /
UEHARA Tomoya c/o Graduate School and Faculty of Pharmaceutical Sciences, Chiba University, 1-8-1, Inohana, Chuo- ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 260-0856 / JP | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19787597.4 | 15.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019JP16156 | Priority number, date | JP20180078487 | 16.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018078487 | [2021/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019203191 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783016 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/10, A61K51/08, C07K16/00, A61K39/395, A61K47/68, A61K47/69, C07D257/02, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K19/00, C07K14/00, C07K16/32 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A61K51/081 (EP,KR);
C07K7/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/1093 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61K47/6887 (US);
A61K47/6889 (US);
A61K51/0482 (US);
A61K51/088 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/1051 (EP);
A61K51/1096 (US);
C07D257/02 (US);
C07K14/001 (EP,KR);
C07K16/32 (EP,KR,US);
C07K5/06078 (US);
C07K5/0812 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | C07K16/00, A61K39/395, A61K47/68, A61K47/69, A61K51/10, C07D257/02, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTER ANTIKÖRPER UND RADIOAKTIV MARKIERTER ANTIKÖRPER | [2021/08] | English: | MODIFIED ANTIBODY AND RADIOACTIVE METAL-LABELLED ANTIBODY | [2021/08] | French: | ANTICORPS MODIFIÉ ET ANTICORPS MARQUÉ PAR UN MÉTAL RADIOACTIF | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | Translation filed | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]WO2017217347 (UNIV KAGOSHIMA [JP]) [ID] 8,9 * examples 8,10 * [A] 1-7,10-12; | [XP]WO2019065774 (UNIV CHIBA NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) [XP] 10,11 * compound b31 * * paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0145] *; | EP3470418 [ ] (UNIV KAGOSHIMA [JP]) [ ] * examples 8,10 *; | EP3689892 [ ] (UNIV CHIBA NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) [ ] * compound b31 * * paragraph [0252] ** paragraph [0256] * | International search | [A]JP2015086213 (UNIV CHIBA) [A] 1-7, 10-12 * , *; | [A]JP2017518975 [A] 5-7; | [A]WO2017217347 (UNIV KAGOSHIMA [JP]) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [PX]WO2019065774 (UNIV CHIBA NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) [PX] 10-12* , [0113], *; | [A] - Misato Uchimura , "A new DOTA derivative providing &(Ga-labeled probes of high in vivo stability", 138th Annual Meeting of the Pharmaceutical Society of Japan, (20180325), vol. 138, pages 1 - 1, XP009523930 [A] 1-7, 10-12 | by applicant | WO2013081091 | WO2016186206 | WO2017150549 | WO2017217347 | WO2017217437 | JP2018078487 | - RODWELL, J. D. et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 2632 - 2636 | - AXUP, J. Y. et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 16101 - 16106 | - TIAN, F. et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (20140000), vol. 111, pages 1766 - 1771 | - ZIMMERMAN, E. S. et al., Bioconjugate chemistry, (20140000), vol. 25, pages 351 - 361 | - SHEN, B. Q. et al., Nature biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 30, pages 184 - 189 | - BERNARDES, G. J. et al., Nature protocols, (20130000), vol. 8, pages 2079 - 2089 | - ARANO, YASUSHI et al., "Chemical design of radiolabeled antibody fragments for low renal radioactivity levels", Cancer research, (19990000), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 128 - 134, XP000982261 | - UEHARA, TOMOYA et al., "Design, synthesis, and evaluation of [188Re] organorhenium-labeled antibody fragments with renal enzyme-cleavable linkage for low renal radioactivity levels", Bioconjugate chemistry, (20070000), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1021/bc0602329, pages 190 - 198, XP055623938 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0602329 | - KELLEY et al., Genetics Engineering Principles and Methods, Plenum Press, (19900000), vol. 12, pages 1 - 19 | - "Solid-Phase Peptide Synthesis", STEWART et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, W.H. Freeman Co., (19850000), vol. 82, page 5132 | - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (19970000), vol. 40, pages 2643 - 2652 |