EP3767936 - PHOTOGRAPHING MODULE HAVING CHAMFER, LIGHT-SENSING ASSEMBLY, MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Bojie 66-68 Shunyu Road, Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Dongli 66-68 Shunyu Road, Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Zhen 66-68 Shunyu Road, Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 04 /
MEI, Qimin 66-68 Shunyu Road, Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Zhenyu 66-68 Shunyu Road, Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Berggren Oy, Tampere Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 19788242.6 | 12.04.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019CN82418 | Priority number, date | CN201810342290 | 17.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810342290 | CN201820543430U | 17.04.2018 Original published format: CN 201820543430 U | [2021/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201167 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767936 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/54, H04N23/55, H04N23/57, G03B17/02 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G03B17/02 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | H04N5/225, G03B17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | FOTOGRAFIERMODUL MIT ABSCHRÄGUNG, LICHTERFASSUNGSANORDNUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/03] | English: | PHOTOGRAPHING MODULE HAVING CHAMFER, LIGHT-SENSING ASSEMBLY, MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/03] | French: | MODULE DE PHOTOGRAPHIE COMPORTANT UN CHANFREIN, ENSEMBLE DE DÉTECTION DE LUMIÈRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | Translation filed | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 19.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101131526 (FUZHUN PREC IND SHENZHEN [CN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2017285292 (CHEN CHING-HUNG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2014293101 (KIM HACK HO [KR]) [A] 1-45* entire document *; | [A]CN107466159 (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [A] 1-45 * entire document *; | [A]CN207010794U (MEIZU TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-45 * entire document *; | [A]CN107734215 (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [A] 1-45 * entire document *; | [PX]CN208299887U (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [PX] 1-45 * entire document * |