Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019226962 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2020 | A3 | WO2019226962 | 28.11.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862675519 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019US27864 | 17.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021188880 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862675519 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019US27864 | 17.04.2019 | US201917057284 | 23.05.2019 | WO2019US33860 | 23.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020330626 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US27864 | 17.04.2019 | US201862658880 | 17.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3796945 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2022 | A4 | EP3796945 | 31.03.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862675519 | 23.05.2018 | WO2019US27864 | 17.04.2019 | WO2019US33860 | 23.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3781019 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2022 | A4 | EP3781019 | 24.02.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US27864 | 17.04.2019 | US201862658880 | 17.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019204432 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2019 | A3 | WO2019204432 | 24.10.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862658880 | 17.04.2018 |