EP3781019 - FLUORINE-18 LABELED COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE IN IMAGING OF BIOLOGICAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornell University Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | For all designated states Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TING, Richard Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 02 /
ARAS, Omer c/o Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ye Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 04 /
HARIKRISHNA, Kommiddi Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 05 /
GUO, Hua Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 06 /
AN, Feifei Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Nandi Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Roberts, Michael Austin Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19788273.1 | 17.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US27864 | Priority number, date | US201862658880P | 17.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862658880 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019204432 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3781019 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K51/04, A61K51/12, A61K101/02, A61B5/00, A61B6/03, A61B6/00, A61B8/13, G01N23/046 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A61K49/0097 (EP);
A61K51/1203 (EP,US);
A61B5/0071 (EP);
A61B6/037 (EP);
A61B6/4417 (EP);
A61B6/481 (EP);
A61B6/508 (EP);
A61K49/0002 (EP);
A61K49/0021 (EP);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0043 (EP,US);
A61K49/0052 (EP);
A61K51/04 (EP);
A61K51/0402 (EP);
A61K51/0421 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | A61B5/00, A61B8/13, G01N23/046 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | FLUOR-18-MARKIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR ABBILDUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEM GEWEBE | [2021/08] | English: | FLUORINE-18 LABELED COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE IN IMAGING OF BIOLOGICAL TISSUE | [2021/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS MARQUÉES AU FLUOR -18 ET LEUR UTILISATION EN IMAGERIE DE TISSUS BIOLOGIQUES | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2019226962 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [E] 1,3,5,6,9-11,17 * paragraph [0089] * * figure 12 * * examples 1-4 * * paragraph [0083] *; | [XP] - HARIKRISHNA KOMMIDI ET AL, "18 F-Positron Emitting/Trimethine Cyanine-Fluorescent Contrast for Image-Guided Prostate Cancer Management", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20180420), vol. 61, no. 9, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.8b00240, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4256 - 4262, XP055580239 [XP] 1-3,5,9-17 * abstract * * page 4259, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 4260, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.8b00240 | [XI] - KOMMIDI HARIKRISHNA ET AL, "An [ 18 F]-Positron-Emitting, Fluorescent, Cerebrospinal Fluid Probe for Imaging Damage to the Brain and Spine", THERANOSTICS, AU, (20170101), vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.7150/thno.19408, ISSN 1838-7640, pages 2377 - 2391, XP055896937 [X] 1,3,9,10,18 * abstract * * scheme 1 * * page 2386, column 2, paragraph 3 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/thno.19408 | [XI] - WANG YE ET AL, "18 F-positron-emitting/fluorescent labeled erythrocytes allow imaging of internal hemorrhage in a murine intracranial hemorrhage model", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW & METABOLISM, US, vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.1177/0271678X16682510, ISSN 0271-678X, (20170301), pages 776 - 786, URL: http://journals.sagepub.com/doi/full-xml/10.1177/0271678X16682510, (20220302), XP055896944 [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0271678X16682510 | [X] - LIU SHUANGLONG ET AL, "Efficient synthesis of fluorescent-PET probes based on [18F]BODIPY dye", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, UK, (20140101), vol. 50, no. 55, doi:10.1039/c4cc01411a, ISSN 1359-7345, page 7371, XP055896953 [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * abstract * * Schemes 1-2 * * table 1 * * figure 1 * * page 7372, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 7373, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c4cc01411a | [X] - RODRIGUEZ ERIK A. ET AL, "New Dioxaborolane Chemistry Enables [ 18 F]-Positron-Emitting, Fluorescent [ 18 F]-Multimodality Biomolecule Generation from the Solid Phase", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, US, (20160518), vol. 27, no. 5, doi:10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.6b00164, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 1390 - 1399, XP055897006 [X] 1-3,5,9-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1396, column 1, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.6b00164 | International search | [A]US6201989 (WHITEHEAD PETER D [CA], et al) [A] 1-5, 11-13, 15-17, 21, 22* ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [A]US2006134001 (FRANGIONI JOHN V [US]) [A] 1-5, 11-13, 15-17, 21, 22 * ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [Y]US2007178511 (LEUNG WAI-YEE [US], et al) [Y] 2, 11-13 * (02.08.20070 para [0045];[0052];[0053] *; | [XY] - AN et al., "A Conjugate of Pentamethine Cyanine and 18F as a Positron Emission Tomography/Near-Infrared Fluorescence Probe for Multimodality Tumor Imaging", International Journal of Molecular Sciences, (20170607), vol. 18, no. 1214, pages 1 - 11, XP055661037 [X] 1, 3, 4, 15-17, 21, 22 * Abstract; pg 2, para 4, figure 1;pg. 6, para 2, Figure 8 * [Y] 2, 5, 11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms18061214 | [Y] - GRABNER et al., "PET with 18F-FDG-Labeled T Lymphocytes for Diagnosis of Acute Rat Renal Allograft Rejection", Journal of Nuclear Medicine, (20130513), vol. 54, no. 7, pages 1147 - 1153, XP055661040 [Y] 5 * . abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.112.109231 |