EP3781677 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED GENE EDITING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELLO, Craig, Cameron 25 Fessenden Road Barrington, RI 02806 / US | 02 /
GHANTA, Krishna Sumanth 174 Providence Road, Apt. 102 Grafton, MA 01519 / US | 03 /
DOKSHIN, Gregoriy 177 Lewis Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 04 /
MIR, Aamir 285 Plantation Street, Apt. 1015 Worcester, MA 01604 / US | 05 /
GNEID, Hassan 53 Dustin Street Worcester, MA 01604 / US | 06 /
WATTS, Jonathan Kenneth 5 Brook Hill Drive Worcester, MA 01609 / US | 07 /
SONTHEIMER, Erik Joseph 236 Islington Road Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19788536.1 | 15.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US27531 | Priority number, date | US201862658368P | 16.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862658368 P | US201862679315P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679315 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019204226 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781677 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/90 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12N15/66 (US);
C12N15/902 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP);
C12N2310/20 (EP);
C12N2310/3181 (EP);
C12N2310/351 (EP);
C12N2320/50 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N15/102, C12Q2525/117, C12Q2525/191 (EP);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN GENEDITIERUNG | [2021/08] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED GENE EDITING | [2021/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR L'ÉDITION GÉNÉTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 20.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014102688 (CELLECTIS [FR]) [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [I] 15; | [XI]WO2017205650 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [I] 15; | [XI] - LEE KUNWOO ET AL, "Synthetically modified guide RNA and donor DNA are a versatile platform for CRISPR-Cas9 engineering", ELIFE, GB, vol. 6, doi:10.7554/eLife.25312, ISSN 2050-084X, (20170502), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC5413346/pdf/elife-25312.pdf, XP055859974 [X] 1-8,10-14,16 * the whole document * * page 8 * [I] 9,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.25312 | [X] - ALICE SOSIC ET AL, "Enzymatic Formation of PEGylated Oligonucleotides", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, US, (20140203), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1021/bc400569z, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 433 - 441, XP055732817 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc400569z | [XP] - Ghanta Krishna S ET AL, "5' Modifications Improve Potency and Efficacy of DNA 1 Donors for Precision Genome Editing", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/354480, (20180622), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/354480v1.full.pdf, (20210629), XP055819401 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/354480 | [XP] - DOKSHIN GREGORIY A ET AL, "Robust Genome Editing with Short Single-Stranded and Long, Partially Single-Stranded DNA Donors in Caenorhabditis elegans", GENETICS, vol. 210, no. 3, doi:10.1534/genetics.118.301532, (20180913), pages 781 - 787, URL: https://watermark.silverchair.com/genetics0781.pdf?token=AQECAHi208BE49Ooan9kkhW_Ercy7Dm3ZL_9Cf3qfKAc485ysgAAAvAwggLsBgkqhkiG9w0BBwagggLdMIIC2QIBADCCAtIGCSqGSIb3DQEHATAeBglghkgBZQMEAS4wEQQMj78vdtH1xCZw0jkZAgEQgIICo585ZG7MkAFhURJueEabS_e3KDhIkXGUvnJolvOIKJuxdjryCyh7Bo5X7OVmMFleiLPKohgQnsdZ9uYW8mervGd, XP055870260 [XP] 13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.118.301532 | International search | [Y]US2008045473 (UHLMANN EUGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 8, 43, 82, 111, 141 * entire document *; | [A]US2012282699 (BUNDOCK PAUL [NL], et al) [A] 1-26, 36-61, 65-100, 103, 105-129, 139-155* entire document *; | [Y]US2013326645 (COST GREGORY J [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4, 38, 39, 107, 108 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2017019867 (DANISCO US INC [US]) [Y] 150 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017051276 (MAY ANDREW PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 7, 18-23, 42, 53-58, 65, 69, 76, 77, 81, 92-97, 110, 121-126 * entire document *; | [XY]US2017058298 (KENNEDY ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 9-17, 24-26, 36, 37, 40, 41, 44-52, 59-61, 66-68, 70-75, 78-80, 83-91, 98-100, 103, 105, 106, 109, 112-120, 127-129, 139, 140, 142-145, 155 * entire document * [Y] 3, 4, 7, 8, 18-23, 38, 39, 42, 43, 53-58, 65, 69, 76, 77, 81, 82, 92-97, 107, 108, 110, 111, 121-126, 141; | [XY]WO2017096041 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 146-149, 151, 152 * entire document * [Y] 150, 153, 154; | [Y]WO2017205650 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 153, 154 * entire document * |