08.07.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.06.2024 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.02.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
16.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
03.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
03.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
25.06.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
22.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
20.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
11.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|