Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021018903 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP13192 | 27.03.2019 | JP2018081315 | 20.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111819507B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2024 | B | CN111819507 | 23.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP13192 | 27.03.2019 | JP2018081315 | 20.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3783451 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2022 | A4 | EP3783451 | 24.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP13192 | 27.03.2019 | JP2018081315 | 20.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019202934 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018081315 | 20.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6988665B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2022 | B2 | JP2019191737 | 31.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018081315 | 20.04.2018 |