EP3782907 - LANDING GEAR AND STIFFENING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/08] | LANDING DEVICE AND STIFFENED MEMBER | ||
[2024/28] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEKI, Yoichi c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19788846.4 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019JP16313 | Priority number, date | JP20180079016 | 17.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018079016 | [2021/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019203229 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782907 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3782907 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/08, B64C25/32, B64C25/52, B64C25/58, F16F7/12 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
F16F7/08 (EP);
B64C25/52 (EP,US);
B64C25/32 (EP);
B64C25/58 (EP);
F16F7/123 (EP);
B64C2025/325 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | B64C25/52, B64C25/32, B64C25/58, B64C27/04, F16F7/00, F16F7/12 | ||
Former IPC [2021/08] | B64C25/58, B64C27/04, F16F7/00, F16F7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANDEVORRICHTUNG UND VERSTEIFTES ELEMENT | [2021/08] | English: | LANDING GEAR AND STIFFENING MEMBER | [2024/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATTERRISSAGE ET ÉLÉMENT RENFORCÉ | [2021/08] |
Former [2021/08] | LANDING DEVICE AND STIFFENED MEMBER | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | Translation filed | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3507466 (FLEUR JEAN L LA); | [YA]JPS5679405U ; | [A]US4645143 (COFFY RENE L [FR]); | [A]US4659069 (ODOBASIC STEVEN L [US]); | [A]US5211359 (RENE ALANDE D [FR], et al); | [YA]US6244538 (HOWARD JOHN V [US], et al); | [A]EP2712804 (AIRBUS HELICOPTERS [FR]); | [A]CN104787312 (CN HELICOPTER RES & DEV INST) | International search | [Y]JPS5679405U ; | [XA]US4645143 (COFFY RENE L [FR]); | [A]US5224669 (GUIMBAL BRUNO [FR]); | [A]WO2009155553 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2015151836 (PRUD HOMME-LACROIX PIERRE [FR], et al); | [Y]JP2016107804 (TOKYO R & D KK) | by applicant | JPH1149097 |